U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fletcher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Mail Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 22, 2019: [Affidavit]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 20, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 26, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • March 21, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • March 21, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.