U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Remark]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • March 27, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.