U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goudy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.