U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 27, 2022: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • May 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Bond]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 29, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 29, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.