U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saechao
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 26, 2018: [Vacate]
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 12, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 30, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.