U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lockett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • August 17, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • August 17, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 26, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2018
  • April 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 02, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.