U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cooper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 12, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 02, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.