U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McLin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • April 15, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Remark]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 15, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 15, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 15, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 13, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • October 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Attachment]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 24, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 24, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 23, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 01, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 01, 2018: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 02, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.