U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [USCA Order]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • September 08, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 04, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 05, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 24, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 29, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 06, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 21, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 15, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 07, 2018: [Rebuttal]
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 03, 2018: [Response]
  • August 02, 2018: [Response in Support]
  • August 02, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 24, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 24, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 13, 2018: [Suppress]
  • July 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • July 02, 2018: [Rebuttal]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2018: [Suppress]
  • June 04, 2018: [Rebuttal]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2018: [Suppress]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Document]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 06, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 03, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 02, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.