U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nichols
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Report re: Probation/Supervised Release (35)]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 16, 2019: [In Chambers Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 17, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 08, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Waiver]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • April 03, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.