U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2023
  • January 02, 2023: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • December 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2022: [Remark]
  • December 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2022: [Revoke]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 08, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 14, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • July 14, 2022: [Recusal]
  • July 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Remark]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2022: [Remark]
  • July 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 06, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 14, 2022: [Release from Custody]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 25, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2021: [Subpoena Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 19, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 24, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 24, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 24, 2020: [Suppress]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sever Defendant]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 17, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • February 01, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 22, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response]
  • October 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 09, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 06, 2019: [Response]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Remark]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response]
  • May 10, 2019: [CJA 30 - Appointment]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 29, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response]
  • April 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 08, 2019: [CJA Appointment Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 28, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 21, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 16, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • August 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2018: [Rebuttal]
  • August 02, 2018: [Response]
  • August 02, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Protective Order]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 10, 2018: [CJA 30 - Appointment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 06, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 03, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 29, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 28, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 28, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 28, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • June 28, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • June 21, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 11, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 08, 2018: [Bond]
  • June 08, 2018: [Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2018: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 05, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • April 03, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 03, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.