U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brunet
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Remark]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Remark]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 14, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 24, 2019: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 24, 2019: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 22, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • January 21, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • January 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 16, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 14, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 11, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • January 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 02, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Produce]
  • October 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 04, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Response to Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 16, 2018: [Response]
  • May 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Response]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 20, 2018: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 04, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 04, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.