U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hennington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment - 2255]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Response]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Response to Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response to Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Response to Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 17, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • November 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Remark]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [USCA Order]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 03, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 16, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 06, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 24, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 21, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 27, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 04, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.