U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crabtree et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 09, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Report re: Probation/Supervised Release (35)]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 15, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 03, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 14, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 11, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2019: [Compel]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 21, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
  • February 21, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 15, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
  • February 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 11, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Bond]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 17, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • December 11, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • December 11, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Suppress]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • September 28, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • September 24, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 13, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 06, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 02, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 02, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 21, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 26, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 10, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 10, 2018: [Waiver]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2018: [Appear]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 04, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 04, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.