U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nguyen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 27, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 01, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 05, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.