U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 07, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 04, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 09, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 05, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.