U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oswalt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 29, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 20, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 05, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 24, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 11, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Waiver]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 05, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • April 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • April 05, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 05, 2018: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.