U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2020: [Response]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order For Restitution]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 03, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2019: [Response]
  • February 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 20, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 21, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2018: [Response]
  • August 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 16, 2018: [Waiver]
  • April 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • April 05, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.