U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 28, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 17, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Competency Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Psychiatric Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Inspect]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response]
  • September 04, 2018: [Discovery]
  • September 04, 2018: [Inspect]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 17, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 13, 2018: [Response]
  • April 13, 2018: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 06, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 06, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • April 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.