U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cheeks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 22, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 22, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 10, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 19, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.