U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 19, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 10, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.