U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Waiver]
  • April 19, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2018: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.