U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dugger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Response to Order]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 17, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 03, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 08, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 08, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2018: [Bond]
  • April 17, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 13, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 12, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.