U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Remark]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Response]
  • September 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 18, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 12, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • April 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 11, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.