U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 06, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 20, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 17, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.