U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Change of Address]
  • April 18, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 09, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 02, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 28, 2018: [Competency Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Psychiatric Report]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Letter]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 10, 2018: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 09, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.