U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 19, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
  • October 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 11, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 11, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 22, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 02, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 17, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 17, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.