U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shedd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 15, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 26, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 17, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.