U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pettaway et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 16, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 03, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 08, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 16, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Compel]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 19, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • April 18, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 18, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.