U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horrisberger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 20, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 20, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.