U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pinckney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 11, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 01, 2021: [Change of Address]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 27, 2021: [Judgment - 2255]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • February 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • January 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 12, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • December 03, 2020: [Change of Address]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 06, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 31, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 21, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Letter]
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 05, 2018: [Mail Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 22, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 07, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • September 18, 2018: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 04, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • September 04, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 04, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Remark]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • May 02, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.