U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 30, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.