U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McAfee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 07, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 10, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 02, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 15, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 13, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.