U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 07, 2022: [Change of Address]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 16, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • June 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 12, 2020: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 21, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 22, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • June 08, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2019: [Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 16, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 18, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 11, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 11, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • July 11, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • July 03, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 01, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.