U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drake
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 13, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • February 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 01, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2018: [Bond]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.