U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wells
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 30, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 24, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 01, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Bond]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 01, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.