U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ladner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2021: [Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 10, 2021: [Rebuttal]
  • August 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 18, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 14, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 08, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 08, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
  • July 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 18, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 15, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 25, 2019: [Remark]
  • June 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 22, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 13, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 05, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 05, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.