U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 22, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 22, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 31, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • May 31, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.