U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McLean
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Remark]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Remark]
  • September 17, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 10, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.