U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouleau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Defendant Severed from Codefendant(s)]
  • February 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 15, 2019: [Remark]
  • February 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 13, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 23, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 12, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • July 12, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.