U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Remark]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2020: [Remark]
  • October 07, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 05, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.