U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Neal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 03, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • May 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2019: [Writ]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 22, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • October 18, 2018: [Application for Writ]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.