U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrera-Tolentino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 13, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 09, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.