U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • November 10, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Response]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 18, 2019: [Remark]
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 20, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 14, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.