U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mills et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 15, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • November 23, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 20, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 15, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 14, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 14, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.