U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 26, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • September 07, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 07, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.