U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 04, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • March 03, 2019: [Competency Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 24, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 21, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 10, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • September 10, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.