U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Summers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 18, 2020: [Attachment]
  • May 18, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 15, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 15, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 08, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2019: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • October 22, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • October 22, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 10, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • September 10, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.