U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 17, 2019: [Remark]
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • June 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 18, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 01, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • February 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 21, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 30, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 28, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 28, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • January 28, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • January 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 17, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • September 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 12, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 11, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.