U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haynes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 18, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 12, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 11, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.